Vesiviljelyn kehittämisryhmä
MMM035:00/2017 Body
The ministries implement the Government Programme, draft acts and other statutes, and promote reforms through different kinds of projects, working groups and bodies. Information on all this is available on the Government website.
All ministries' projects are available on the Government website
Basic information In progress
Project number MMM035:00/2017
Case numbers 952/06.02/2017 , VN/4646/2020
Set by Ministry of Agriculture and Forestry
Term/schedule 18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Date of appointment 18.9.2017
Type of body Working group
Contact person
Saana Tarhanen, Asiantuntija
firstname.lastname@mmm.fi
Goals and results
Kehittämisryhmän tehtävänä on osallistua Euroopan meri- ja kalatalousrahaston Suomen toimintaohjelman jatkuvaan arviointi- ja ennakointityöhön. Kehittämisryhmä seuraa muutoinkin alan kehitystä, tehostaa vesiviljelyelinkeinoon vaikuttavien tahojen välistä tiedonvaihtoa ja syventää tukia myöntävien viranomaisten tuntemusta alan keskeisistä ongelmista ja kehittämismahdollisuuksista.
Ungrouped
Person
Role, Term
Risto, Lampinen
kalatalousneuvos
Ministry of Agriculture and Forestry
Role: Chair
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Risto, Lampinen
kalatalousneuvos
Ministry of Agriculture and Forestry
Role: Person in charge
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Tarhanen, Saana
Asiantuntija
Ministry of Agriculture and Forestry
Role: Secretary
3.10.2019 – 31.12.2025
Tarhanen, Saana
Asiantuntija
Ministry of Agriculture and Forestry
Role: Project contact person
22.10.2020 – 31.12.2025
Arvonen, Kaj
Toimitusjohtaja
Arvo-Tec Oy
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Halonen, Timo
erityisasiantuntija
Ministry of Agriculture and Forestry
Role: Owner
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Heikkilä, Mari
Markkinointiviestintäpäällikkö
Nordic Fish Oy
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Helenius, Nina
Yksikönpäällikkö
Varsinais-Suomen ELY-keskus
Role: Member
21.12.2023 – 31.12.2025
Helkimo, Johanna
Erityisasiantuntija
Ministry of the Environment
Role: Member
21.10.2020 – 31.12.2025
Kantola, Tomi
Liiketoimintajohtaja
Raisio Oyj
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Karjalainen, Timo
Toimitusjohtaja
Laitakarin Kala Oy
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Lankinen, Yrjö
Toimitusjohtaja
Savon Taimen Oy
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Leed, Jorma
Tuotantopäällikkö
Nordic Trout Oy
Role: Member
21.12.2023 – 31.12.2025
Nieminen, Tero
kalatalousasiantuntija
Pohjois-Savon elinkeino-, liikenne- ja ympäristökeskus
Role: Member
21.12.2023 – 31.12.2025
Salonen, Ville
Ympäristöneuvos
Etelä-Suomen aluehallintovirasto
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Sankelo, Janne
Toimitusjohtaja
Suomen Kalankasvattajaliitto ry
Role: Member
21.12.2023 – 31.12.2025
Timonen, Maria
Vesistöasiantuntija
Varsinais-Suomen ELY-keskus
Role: Member
21.12.2023 – 31.12.2025
Vielma, Jouni
Johtava tutkija
Luonnonvarakeskus
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Viisanen, Jani
Kehittämisen asiantuntija
Metsähallitus
Role: Member
21.10.2020 – 31.12.2025
Vilhunen, Sampsa
Ohjelmapäällikkö
WWF Suomi
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 31.12.2025
Metsäniemi, Tuomas
Kalatalouden verkostokoordinaattori
Meri- ja kalatalousverkosto
Role: Secretary
18.9.2017 – 3.10.2019
Metsäniemi, Tuomas
Kalatalouden verkostokoordinaattori
Meri- ja kalatalousverkosto
Role: Project contact person
18.9.2017 – 22.10.2020
Haaranen, Tarja
ympäristöneuvos
Ministry of the Environment
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 21.10.2020
Kalliokoski, Okku
Ylitarkastaja
Varsinais-Suomen ELY-keskus
Role: Member
21.10.2020 – 21.12.2023
Maukonen, Esko
Kehittämisen asiantuntija
Metsähallitus
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 21.10.2020
Ranta-aho, Kari
kalatalouspäällikkö
Varsinais-Suomen elinkeino-, liikenne- ja ympäristökeskus
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 21.10.2020
Romar, Alf-Håkan
Toimitusjohtaja
Nordic Trout
Role: Member
3.10.2019 – 21.12.2023
Skytén-Suominen, Irja
Hallituksen puheenjohtaja
Suomen Kalankasvattajaliitto ry
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 21.12.2023
Takkunen, Timo
kalatalouspäällikkö
Pohjois-Savon elinkeino-, liikenne- ja ympäristökeskus
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 21.12.2023
Wideskog, Mirva
ylitarkastaja
Varsinais-Suomen elinkeino-, liikenne- ja ympäristökeskus
Role: Member
18.9.2017 – 21.12.2023